VA SB859 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Open-end lending by banks, savings institutions, and credit unions; credit cards; grace period. Adjusts the period used in determining whether a borrower has repaid his open-end credit card balance in full and therefore is exempt from a finance charge on purchases of merchandise or services. The measure provides that a bank, savings institution, or credit union shall not impose a finance charge on purchases of merchandise or services by credit card if payment in full of the unpaid balance owing for extensions of credit is received prior to the payment due date and requires the payment due date to be at least 25 days later than the billing date. The requirement for a 25-day grace period for payments on an open-end credit plan by a credit union that does not involve a credit card is deleted. Under existing law, the next billing date, rather than the payment due date, applies.
Title
Open-end lending by banks, savings institutions, etc.; determining grace period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0453) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 453 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-18 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB859ER) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Title replaced 15104994D-H1 |
2015-02-16 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed House with substitute (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2015-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB859H1 |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104994D-H1 |
2015-02-12 | House | Read third time |
2015-02-11 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104994D-H1 |
2015-02-10 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-30 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB859S1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 15103930D-S1 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 15103930D-S1 |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102326D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1800 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)