VA SJR118 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ118ER)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-12 - Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ118ER)
Summary
Memorial resolution; Dr. Francis Merrill Foster, Sr. Notes with great sadness the loss of Dr. Francis Merrill Foster, Sr., native son, beloved dentist, and local historian.
Title
Memorial resolution; Dr. Francis Merrill Foster, Sr.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-12 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SJ118ER) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Agreed to by House | |
2008-01-18 | House: Laid on Speaker's table | |
2008-01-18 | House: Received | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Agreed to by Senate | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Introduced bill reprinted 084201264 | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Laid on Clerk's Desk | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Presented 084201264 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SJ118 |