WA HB1023 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing certain adult family homes to increase capacity to eight beds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing certain adult family homes to increase capacity to eight beds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-31HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-31HouseChapter 220, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-31HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-09HousePassed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-09HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2020-03-04SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-04SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04SenateFloor amendment
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-25SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-24SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-24SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-24SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21SenatePublic hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-21SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2020-01-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-01-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-16HouseFloor amendment
2020-01-16HouseReturned to second reading for amendment.
2020-01-14HousePlaced on third reading.
2019-04-28HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-04-15SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-04-15SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-15SenateCommittee amendment
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-03-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-03-20SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-03-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-11SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-02-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-02-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-02-07House1st substitute bill substituted
2019-02-05HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-01HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-01HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-30HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-22HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2018-12-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5396 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1023&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1023.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1023-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1023-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1023-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1023-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116981&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-07-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1023&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116981&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1023&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116981&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=01-16-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1023&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116981&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1023&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=116981&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1023&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback