WA HB1048 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the process for prevailing parties to recover judgments in small claims court.
Title
Modifying the process for prevailing parties to recover judgments in small claims court.
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Drew Stokesbary [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Kelly Chambers [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 251, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-18 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-18 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-18 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |