WA HB1055 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing law enforcement to arrest persons in violation of certain no-contact orders involving victims of trafficking and promoting prostitution offenses.
Title
Authorizing law enforcement to arrest persons in violation of certain no-contact orders involving victims of trafficking and promoting prostitution offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-08 | House | Chapter 18, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-24 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |