WA HB1063 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing seventeen year olds to participate in primary elections.
Title
Authorizing seventeen year olds to participate in primary elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | SGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |