WA HB1117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending motor vehicle laws to align with federal definitions, make technical corrections, and move an effective date to meet a federal timeline.
Title
Amending motor vehicle laws to align with federal definitions, make technical corrections, and move an effective date to meet a federal timeline.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-01-31 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-11 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5230 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1117&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1117.pdf |