WA HB1135 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-18 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the annual gross sales limits for cottage food operations.
Title
Concerning the annual gross sales limits for cottage food operations.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Overstreet [R] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Cathy Dahlquist [R] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] |
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-18 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-30 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-01-23 | House | AGNR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-23 | House | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |