WA HB1139 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 5/8/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 5/8/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the current and future educator workforce supply.
Title
Expanding the current and future educator workforce supply.
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Effective date 5/8/2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Chapter 295, 2019 Laws PV. |
2019-05-08 | House | Governor partially vetoed. |
2019-04-28 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 26; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-08 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |