WA HB1164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning dual credit programs.
Title
Concerning dual credit programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-07 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5427 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1164&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1164.pdf |