WA HB1182 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - Referred to Finance.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a tax exemption for the first 20,000 gallons of wine sold by a winery in Washington.
Title
Providing a tax exemption for the first 20,000 gallons of wine sold by a winery in Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Regulated Substances & Gaming (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2024-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-22 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Regulated Substances & Gaming. |
2023-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2023-01-26 | House | RSG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming. |
2023-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5013 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-31 - Referred to Ways & Means.