WA HB1210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective date 6/30/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective date 6/30/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recording of school board meetings.
Title
Concerning the recording of school board meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee on State Government & Elections: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - House - House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Effective date 6/30/2024. |
2023-04-13 | House | Chapter 67, 2023 Laws. |
2023-04-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | SGE - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government & Elections. |
2023-02-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-02-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-01 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-01-31 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-25 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 320 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 30 | 035 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
42 | 56 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 56 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |