WA HB1212 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the names of county auditors and the secretary of state in their official capacity on election materials.
Title
Prohibiting the names of county auditors and the secretary of state in their official capacity on election materials.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |