WA HB1218 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing public-private partnership best practices for nontoll transportation projects.
Title
Implementing public-private partnership best practices for nontoll transportation projects.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Judith Clibborn [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] |
Rep. Linda Kochmar [R] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Liz Pike [R] |
Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Chad Magendanz [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
Rep. Luis Moscoso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-09 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-09 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2015-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1218&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1218.pdf |