WA HB1296 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: Senate Health Care & Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - Referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: Senate Health Care & Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning continuing care retirement communities.
Title
Concerning continuing care retirement communities.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-06 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-15 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5796 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.