WA HB1357 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modernizing the prior authorization process.
Title
Modernizing the prior authorization process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on Health Care & Wellness: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023*. |
2023-05-09 | House | Chapter 382, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2023-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-04 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-15 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 43 | 0161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 43 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text |