WA HB1402 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the rights and obligations associated with incapacitated persons and other vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning the rights and obligations associated with incapacitated persons and other vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-10 | House | Chapter 268, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-10 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-19 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-03 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-21 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-21 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-02 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |