WA HB1412 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning nonresident pharmacies.
Title
Concerning nonresident pharmacies.
Sponsors
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-04-17 | House | Chapter 25, 2019 Laws. |
2019-04-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-15 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | HCW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5459 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.