WA HB1466 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing trust companies to be organized as, or convert to, limited liability companies under certain conditions.
Title
Allowing trust companies to be organized as, or convert to, limited liability companies under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Business & Financial Services. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-09 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-09 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-28 | BFS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-01-28 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-01-28 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-21 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5375 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-13 - Effective date 7/22/2011.