WA HB1578 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing threats to southern resident killer whales by improving the safety of oil transportation.
Title
Reducing threats to southern resident killer whales by improving the safety of oil transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 59 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-08 | House | Chapter 289, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 59; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-18 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 32; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at time TBA. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2019-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Environment & Energy. |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5578 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.