WA HB1598 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing code cities of a certain size with the ability to annex unincorporated areas without a referendum provision pursuant to a jointly approved interlocal agreement with the county.
Title
Providing code cities of a certain size with the ability to annex unincorporated areas without a referendum provision pursuant to a jointly approved interlocal agreement with the county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |