WA HB1622 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning drought preparedness and response.
Title
Concerning drought preparedness and response.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joel Kretz [R] | Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] |
Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Sen. Sharon Shewmake [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | House | Chapter 168, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-07 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 87; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | AWNP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. |
2019-03-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 80; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | CB - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | RDAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5675 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.