WA HB1747 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the withdrawal of land from a designated classification.
Title
Concerning the withdrawal of land from a designated classification.
Sponsors
Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] | Rep. Mike Volz [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Rep. Matt Shea [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-08 | House | Chapter 251, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:00 PM. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-23 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |