WA HB1799 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the registration of business entities that qualify as data brokers.
Title
Concerning the registration of business entities that qualify as data brokers.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-09 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | New Code | See Bill Text |