WA HB1901 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the sunset on changes to the unemployment insurance voluntary contribution program.
Title
Removing the sunset on changes to the unemployment insurance voluntary contribution program.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Springer [D] | Rep. Suzanne Schmidt [R] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] |
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-13 | House | Chapter 52, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-12 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2023-12-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |