WA HB1916 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Improving the delivery of child support services to families by increasing flexibility and efficiency.
Title
Improving the delivery of child support services to families by increasing flexibility and efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Chapter 275, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-07 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Floor amendment |
2019-03-01 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-22 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |