WA HB1975 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing sports wagering subject to the terms of tribal-state gaming compacts.
Title
Authorizing sports wagering subject to the terms of tribal-state gaming compacts.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1975&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1975.pdf |