WA HB2133 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating trespassing on a public school bus as a felony offense.
Title
Designating trespassing on a public school bus as a felony offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Community Safety, Justice, & Reentry. |
2024-01-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5891 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | 94a | 515 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
9a | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |