WA HB2156 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House General Government Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revising the authority for certification by the criminal justice training commission.
Title
Revising the authority for certification by the criminal justice training commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-02-18 | HS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-11 | First reading, referred to Human Services. |