WA HB2180 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning sales and use tax exemptions for certain plug-in hybrid electric vehicles.
Title
Concerning sales and use tax exemptions for certain plug-in hybrid electric vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Rep. Deborah Eddy [D] | Sen. John McCoy [D] |
Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Finance. | |
2009-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-18 | TEC - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-18 | TEC - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology, and Energy & Communications at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-11 | First reading, referred to Technology, Energy & Communications. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=2180&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2180.pdf |