WA HB2204 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a limited spirits retail license.
Title
Concerning the creation of a limited spirits retail license.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] | Rep. Chris Corry [R] |
Rep. William Jenkin [R] | Rep. Larry Hoff [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] |
Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2019-12-04 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6104 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM.