WA HB2259 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding background check requirements for certain educational institutions.
Title
Expanding background check requirements for certain educational institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | House | Chapter 22, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-04 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2019-12-20 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6100 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.