WA HB2260 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing civil penalties for the unlawful sale or supply of alcohol to minors.
Title
Establishing civil penalties for the unlawful sale or supply of alcohol to minors.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Waters [R] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] |
Rep. Greg Cheney [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-13 | House | Chapter 71, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-04 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | LC - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2024-02-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-23 | House | RSG - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6201 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.