WA HB2265 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing climbing facility regulations and requirements.
Title
Establishing climbing facility regulations and requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-31 | House | CRJ - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
18 | 235 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 42 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |