WA HB2266 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Effective date 7/14/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Effective date 7/14/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deferring implementation of class size reduction and school employee staffing formula changes.
Title
Deferring implementation of class size reduction and school employee staffing formula changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage on Reconsideration (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | House | Effective date 7/14/2015. |
2015-07-14 | House | Chapter 38, 2015 Laws 3rd Special Session. |
2015-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-07-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 11; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Notice given to reconsider vote on third reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Third reading, failed; yeas, 27; nays, 17; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2015-06-29 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 72; nays, 26; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-06-29 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-06-29 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-06-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-06-27 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-06-24 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2015-06-23 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-06-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-06-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2015-06-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2015-06-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:00 PM. |
2015-06-22 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |