WA HB2280 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing that money laundering forfeited proceeds and property be used for improvement of gambling-related law enforcement activities.
Title
Authorizing that money laundering forfeited proceeds and property be used for improvement of gambling-related law enforcement activities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2019-12-27 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6119 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2280&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2280.pdf |