WA HB2316 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning membership in the public employees' retirement system for certain part-time bus drivers employed full-time by the federal government.
Title
Concerning membership in the public employees' retirement system for certain part-time bus drivers employed full-time by the federal government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-31 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5881 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-25 - Effective date 6/6/2024.