WA HB2343 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defining "willful" in the chapter regarding abuse of vulnerable adults.
Title
Defining "willful" in the chapter regarding abuse of vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-06 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-24 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-12-29 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6111 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.