WA HB2355 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the use of alternative traction devices on tires under certain conditions.
Title
Concerning the use of alternative traction devices on tires under certain conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-02-11 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2012-02-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2012-02-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-09 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-02-08 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-02-01 | TR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-01 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-02-01 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-01-12 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6112 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-23 - Effective date 6/7/2012.