WA HB2404 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the definition of an electric personal assistive mobility device.
Title
Expanding the definition of an electric personal assistive mobility device.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] | Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Matt Manweller [R] |
Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-14 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2014-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-04 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-04 | House | TR - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |