WA HB2406 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying administrative processes for managing deposits and cost reimbursements of the energy facility site evaluation council.
Title
Modifying administrative processes for managing deposits and cost reimbursements of the energy facility site evaluation council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2014-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-01-31 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-01-28 | House | TED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-01-28 | House | TED - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-01-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |