WA HB2411 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-02 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing wasted food in order to fight hunger and reduce environmental impacts.
Title
Reducing wasted food in order to fight hunger and reduce environmental impacts.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Vandana Slatter [D] | Rep. Nicole Macri [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |