WA HB2491 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governor to enter into compacts with federally recognized Indian tribes principally located within Washington state for the issuance of tribal license plates and vehicle registration.
Title
Authorizing the governor to enter into compacts with federally recognized Indian tribes principally located within Washington state for the issuance of tribal license plates and vehicle registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Ramos [D] | Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Sen. Javier Valdez [D] |
Rep. Lisa Callan [D] | Rep. Debra Lekanoff [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-25 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-25 | House | Chapter 118, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6251 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.