WA SB6251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governor to enter into compacts with federally recognized Indian tribes principally located within Washington state for the issuance of tribal license plates and vehicle registration.
Title
Authorizing the governor to enter into compacts with federally recognized Indian tribes principally located within Washington state for the issuance of tribal license plates and vehicle registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2491 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6251&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6251.pdf |