WA HB2518 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the safe and efficient transmission and distribution of natural gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the safe and efficient transmission and distribution of natural gas.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-18HouseChapter 32, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-18HouseGovernor signed.
2020-03-11HouseDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-10SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-26SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-25SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-25SenateMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-25SenateENET - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
2020-02-16HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-02-16HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-16HouseFloor amendment
2020-02-16House2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-14HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-11HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-11HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-02-11HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-10HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-03HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-01-30HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-01-30HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-28HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2020-01-15HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2518&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2518.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2518-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2518-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2518-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/2518-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/2518-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121266&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=02-16-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2518&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121266&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=2518&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback