WA HB2576 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning private detention facilities.
Title
Concerning private detention facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | House | Chapter 284, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-16 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-06 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6375 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.
SB6442 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 4/2/2020.
SB6442 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 4/2/2020.