WA HB2585 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning income eligibility for temporary assistance for needy families benefits for a child.
Title
Concerning income eligibility for temporary assistance for needy families benefits for a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-03-27 | House | Chapter 75, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-02-17 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPH - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-06 | House | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-06 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Health & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health & Human Services. |
2014-02-03 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-03 | House | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 6:00 PM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Same As/Similar To
SB6394 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.