WA HB2592 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tracked and wheeled all-terrain vehicles.
Title
Concerning tracked and wheeled all-terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-05 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6363 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=2592&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/2592.pdf |