WA HB2624 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the applicability of child abduction statutes to residential provisions ordered by a court.
Title
Clarifying the applicability of child abduction statutes to residential provisions ordered by a court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-05 | House | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-05 | House | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB6539 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-03 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.