WA HCR4405 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying the status of bills, resolutions, and memorials.
Title
Specifying the status of bills, resolutions, and memorials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-01-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Third reading, adopted. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2022-01-10 | House | Adopted. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-01-10 | House | First Reading. |
2022-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |